Financial history THE QUAKER PEACE STUDIES TRUST

Charity number: 529095
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £273.39k £29.84k £15.12k £16.93k £12.46k
Total expenditure £65.48k £60.80k £66.66k £81.13k £47.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A