Trustees THE QUAKER PEACE STUDIES TRUST

Charity number: 529095
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEFFREY BEATTY Chair 01 March 2015
None on record
Geoffrey William Tansey Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Ann Kathryn Bettys Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Melanie Claire Thomas Trustee 08 October 2021
None on record
Malcolm Bowker Trustee 10 May 2019
HESLINGTON VILLAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Susan Clarkson Trustee 11 May 2018
FRIENDS HOUSE MOSCOW
Received: On time
Liz Scurfield Trustee 09 February 2018
None on record
David Olver Trustee 18 April 2013
QUAKERS IN YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
PETER JOHN ECCLES Trustee 07 February 2012
None on record