Trustees SKIPTON MECHANICS INSTITUTE
Charity number: 529116
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Peel | Chair | 08 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Pears | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruksana Mahmood | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Jonelle Yeoman | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Dudley | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Syers | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Daniels | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
David E Nutter | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ian Lockwood | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JA BAINES | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ji Mukherjee | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY GEOFFREY BARRETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR W J BARRON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHONA E WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON R SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS L ASHWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR D T HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.