THE SMITH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 529132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Grant McIntosh Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
David Duncan Trustee 24 November 2020 None on record
Michelle Cuffe Trustee 06 July 2021 None on record
ROGER JAMES TILBROOK Chair 04 March 2008 None on record
Andrew Fairbairn Trustee 10 March 2020 None on record
Brendan Heneghan Trustee 10 July 2018 None on record