Financial history KING'S SCHOOL PONTEFRACT ENDOWMENT CHARITY AND OTHER CHARITIES

Charity number: 529274
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.74k £26.49k £8.14k £15.88k £16.24k
Total expenditure £19.31k £15.70k £3.70k £11.98k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A