TREETON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 529423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 July 2020 26 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 July 2019 26 March 2021 320 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 July 2018 26 March 2021 686 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 July 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 10 July 2016 15 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 July 2016 Not Required