TREETON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 529423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 10/07/2016 10/07/2017 10/07/2018 10/07/2019 10/07/2020
Total gross income £228 £0 £85 £138 £145
Total expenditure £150 £750 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A