AYSGARTH SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 529538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 20 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 April 2017 On time Download