AYSGARTH SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 529538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £3.56m £3.82m £4.11m £4.02m £3.77m
Total expenditure £3.40m £3.43m £3.60m £3.63m £3.71m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £35.67k £197.28k £266.57k £54.94k £25.26k
Income - Other trading activities £65.79k £49.22k £47.86k £44.97k £647
Income - Charitable activities £3.32m £3.56m £3.74m £3.90m £3.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £371 £50 £2.14k £4.51k £4.33k
Income - Other £137.47k £9.86k £50.97k £11.89k £74.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.35m £3.36m £3.58m £3.61m £3.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.06k £46.39k £2.90k £403 £846
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £38.47k £21.72k £23.24k £23.13k £187