THE YORKSHIRE PHILOSOPHICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 529709
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £67.78k £54.78k £41.55k £41.34k £25.38k
Total expenditure £60.96k £37.51k £51.68k £47.90k £30.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A