WESLEYAN METHODIST SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individual children/young people, who have attended for not less than two years both a public elementary school in the Borough of Beverley and a Wesleyan Methodist School, for their further education/training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 September 1964: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Francesca Thea Rhys | Chair | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Birt | Trustee | 19 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN CHRISTIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298 | £300 | £269 | £281 | £316 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 OCTOBER 1905 VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
ASSISTING PUPILS TO ATTEND SCHOOLS, INSTITUTIONS OR CLASSES, FOR PURPOSES OF EDUCATION OTHER THAN ELEMENTARY ELIGIBILITY NOT LESS THAT TWO YEARS AT ANY TIME ATTENDING A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL IN THE BOROUGH OF BEVERLEY, WITH NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS ATTENDANCE AT A WESLEYAN METHODIST SUNDAY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
BEVERLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Toll Gavel United Church
Toll Gavel
BEVERLEY
East Riding of Yorkshire
HU17 9AA
- Phone:
- 01482880300
- Email:
- tollgaveloffice@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window