THE BRONTE SOCIETY

Charity number: 529952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 April 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 13 April 2017 On time Download