Accounts and annual returns HIGHFIELD PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 532262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 10 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 October 2020 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 October 2020 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 27 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window