Financial history HIGHFIELD PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 532262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.93m £1.96m £2.06m £2.05m £1.87m
Total expenditure £1.75m £1.96m £1.96m £2.05m £1.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £44.70k £8.00k £3.50k £3.50k £500
Income - Other trading activities £5.29k £12.76k £15.86k £27.87k £11.24k
Income - Charitable activities £1.88m £1.94m £2.04m £2.02m £1.75m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £424
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £100.49k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £3.50k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.74m £1.96m £1.96m £2.05m £1.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.86k £0 £0 £0 £0