Trustees HIGHFIELD PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 532262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shona Moylon Trustee 03 February 2022
None on record
Michael Illsley Trustee 16 March 2018
None on record
Divia Patel-Smith Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
NICOLA MASON ACA Trustee 04 October 2016
None on record
JOHN ROBERT WOOD Trustee 05 March 2015
LEVENS VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
BENJAMIN ROBERT HALL Trustee 05 March 2015
None on record
EMAN MOHAMED SAMI AHMED Trustee 13 February 2014
None on record
JUDITH ALICIA TEAGUE NAIRN Trustee 13 February 2014
None on record
DARREN WHITMAN Trustee 08 July 2013
None on record
WILLIAM ROBERT GARMENT Trustee 30 June 2011
None on record