Financial history MARJORIE WILLIS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 532309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £465 £345 £557 £659 £17.21k
Total expenditure £306 £5.35k £922 £507 £14.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.46k