Charity overview JOSEPH DENT (TWO FIFTHS OF INCOME)
Charity number: 210020-8
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 27/5/1898, 19/1/1900 AND 12/3/1907
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR
Area of benefit
CIVIL PARISH OF ILFORD AS CONSTITUTED IN 1898.
Registration history
- 27 August 1965: Standard registration
- 09 April 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.