Charity overview NATIONAL RELIEF PRINCE OF WALES FUND
Charity number: 210922-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED DATED 10 DECEMBER 1941 AND SCHEMES OF 17 JULY 1959 AND 12 APRIL 1960
Charitable objects
DONATION TO ASSIST BRITISH WAR DISABLED OF THE 1914/18 WAR AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO HAVE SETTLED OVERSEAS OR DESIRE TO DO SO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 25 September 1962: Standard registration
- 27 April 1984: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.