Accounts and annual returns T L F SPORTS CLUB

Charity Number: 700087
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2009 17 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2008 08 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 10 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 20 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2005 21 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required