Trustees THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, LOSTOCK GRALAM, CHURCH HALL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 700139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald Cross | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Maureen Pickering | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peggy Roberts | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Ridley | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cliff | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN BOWKER | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hague | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SHEEN SRN RMN | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM DENNIS SHEEN | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|||||
RAYMOND JAMES WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN EDWARD CROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Diana Cross | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.