Financial history NORTHERN BRAINWAVE APPEAL

Charity number: 700202
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £27.41k £27.65k £18.53k £17.98k £33.46k
Total expenditure £13.98k £120.09k £61.31k £2.89k £8.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A