Financial history THE OLD SCHOOL HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 700293
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.96k £10.97k £14.42k £15.75k £18.93k
Total expenditure £10.23k £13.79k £13.24k £10.32k £12.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £2.00k £2.00k £12.00k £9.78k