THE BLACKHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 700295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £138.18k £135.51k £124.31k £147.39k £217.94k
Total expenditure £149.27k £139.47k £123.59k £124.20k £149.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £4.65k £300 N/A