THE ROTHERHAM HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 700356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 January 2017 On time Download