THE ROTHERHAM HOSPICE TRUST

Charity number: 700356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £5.71m £5.87m £6.17m £6.07m £6.60m
Total expenditure £5.97m £5.92m £5.84m £5.86m £6.07m
Income from government contracts £0 £3.57m £3.71m £3.58m £4.36m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £66.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £802.31k £721.80k £1.14m £1.08m £705.89k
Income - Other trading activities £1.43m £1.58m £1.46m £1.41m £1.52m
Income - Charitable activities £3.48m £3.57m £3.56m £3.58m £4.36m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.50k £399 £610 £6.45k £4.96k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £151.48k £259.55k £629.88k £627.04k £227.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.98m £4.78m £4.76m £4.83m £4.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £992.16k £1.13m £1.08m £1.03m £1.13m
Expenditure - Governance £34.47k £38.23k £31.33k £60.28k £52.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0