THE GUJARATI ASSOCIATION, WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity number: 700625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 May 2019 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 May 2019 113 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 September 2018 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 September 2018 234 days late Download