THE GUJARATI ASSOCIATION, WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity number: 700625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £135.65k £177.90k £210.77k £144.75k £29.88k
Total expenditure £73.92k £109.53k £113.38k £105.87k £37.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A