Trustees SHEFFIELD WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 700638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Scott McKenzie Dr Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Sarah Blandy Trustee 24 September 2020
HEELEY DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Helen Francis Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Holly Schofield Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
James Hall Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Kris Mackay Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Ben Stone Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Dr Stephen Campbell Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
Mark Phillip Ridler Trustee 21 September 2017
None on record
Thomas Dodd Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
Suzanne Leckie Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
Andrew Parker Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
Andrew Perrins Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record