WOODSEATS MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 700669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required