WOODSEATS MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 700669
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joan Ellis Trustee 03 February 2020 None on record
Daniel Charles Powell Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Scott Andrew Jones Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
Rebecca Louise Jones Trustee 25 February 2019 None on record
Mary Hilda Newey Chair 08 September 2013 None on record
Dylan Francis Lambert Trustee 03 February 2020 None on record
John Highfield Trustee 18 January 2016 None on record