ONE WORLD LINK (WARWICK DISTRICT - BO DISTRICT)

Charity number: 700714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN BAYLISS Trustee None on record
HELENA WHITE Trustee 04 February 2017
THE AFRICAN MATERNITY LINK Received: On time
Phil Clarke Trustee 29 November 2014 None on record
CHRISTOPHER WARR Trustee
LADBROKE MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST Received: On time
PAUL ATKINS Trustee 29 March 2011 None on record
JOHN ARCHER Trustee 06 November 2012 None on record
ELIZABETH LOUISE GARRETT Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record
Richard Alan Hall Chair 30 January 2016 None on record
Johannes Mallah Jr Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
Cllr Matthew Raymond Western Trustee 03 December 2013 None on record
MR CHRIS KING Trustee None on record
JANE MARGARET KNIGHT Trustee None on record
Anthony Paul Wood Trustee 04 February 2017 None on record
ALAN JOHN MOSS Trustee None on record
ELIZABETH MAIR EVANS Trustee 03 December 2013 None on record