Financial history THE FRIENDS OF WASHINGTON OLD HALL

Charity number: 700732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £8.12k £5.54k £5.50k £6.02k £1.70k
Total expenditure £9.54k £8.37k £3.44k £1.32k £1.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A