Accounts and annual returns THE RAPHAEL AND MARIKA LEVY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 700851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 June 2022 16 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 June 2021 28 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 June 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 25 June 2019 02 May 2020 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 25 June 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 25 June 2018 Not Required