Financial history THE RAPHAEL AND MARIKA LEVY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 700851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/06/2018 25/06/2019 25/06/2020 25/06/2021 25/06/2022
Total gross income £10.14k £15.01k £11.67k £3.34k £4.61k
Total expenditure £10.67k £17.18k £11.13k £9.21k £6.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A