THE SQUARE CHAPEL TRUST

Charity number: 700985
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.22m £2.31m £5.09m £1.68m £1.82m
Total expenditure £1.14m £1.15m £1.19m £1.99m £5.68m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £182.40k £177.33k £418.49k £89.59k £226.05k
Income - Donations and legacies £399.79k £263.15k £418.49k £484.88k £378.59k
Income - Other trading activities £21.85k £33.78k £21.62k £445.22k £572.59k
Income - Charitable activities £800.35k £2.01m £4.65m £660.97k £805.29k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £174 £397 £496 £41 £4
Income - Other £0 £10.27k £0 £91.65k £65.85k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.08m £1.13m £1.41m £1.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £47.56k £62.01k £580.63k £711.57k
Expenditure - Governance £14.90k £13.09k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £18.72k £0 £0 £3.46m