NEWARK AND SHERWOOD COMMUNITY HUB

Charity number: 701015
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Newark and Sherwood Community Hub is one of six play forums in Nottinghamshire which promote, develop and support childrens play, we also run Millgate Community Centre which supports our local community providing a low cost venue for groups to come together, learn new skills and socialise in a warm safe environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2018

Total income: £62,624
Total expenditure: £61,103

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1989: Standard registration
  • 20 June 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 20 June 2019: Funds transferred to 1164851 Newark and Sherwood Community Hub
  • 08 August 2024: Funds received from 701072 BROXTOWE BOROUGH PLAY FORUM
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEWARK PLAY PROJECT (Working name)
  • NEWARK AND SHERWOOD PLAY SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/05/2018
Total gross income £127.83k £108.20k £89.99k £57.68k £62.62k
Total expenditure £132.99k £109.00k £90.07k £62.21k £61.10k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.00k £37.65k £27.42k £35.10k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2018 15 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 15 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 November 2016 On Time