Financial history 10th Widnes (Hough Green) Scout Group

Charity number: 701064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £168.47k £171.90k £168.89k £177.14k £182.83k
Total expenditure £12.06k £12.64k £9.74k £13.29k £10.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.33k £16.10k