ST WILFRID'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 701081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 April 2021 294 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 356 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 April 2021 660 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 722 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 April 2021 1025 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 20 April 2021 1390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required