ST WILFRID'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 701081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £8.36k £13.04k £55.80k £25.53k £3.87k
Total expenditure £4.37k £8.70k £38.12k £34.44k £3.37k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A