LINK-ABILITY

Charity number: 701132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.18m £3.45m £3.59m £3.84m £4.03m
Total expenditure £3.18m £3.39m £3.61m £3.84m £3.97m
Income from government contracts £3.13m £3.38m £3.57m £3.83m £3.83m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £192.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £15.00k £0 £0 £750 £570
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.13m £3.38m £3.57m £3.83m £4.02m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £13.00k £9.28k £9.33k £5.22k £123
Income - Other £21.92k £69.45k £9.05k £8.04k £6.57k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.18m £3.39m £3.61m £3.84m £3.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £2.73k £2.66k
Expenditure - Governance £3.25k £0 £0 £3.76k £3.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £2.73k £2.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0