SELLY OAK AREA CARETAKER SOCIETY

Charity number: 701171
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £40.45k £49.17k £67.25k £53.13k £209.22k
Total expenditure £57.04k £60.11k £68.22k £55.94k £192.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.85k £2.00k £12.00k N/A £141.00k