LLANDDERFEL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 701200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/03/2016 30/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.93k £9.59k £9.50k £4.47k £6.20k
Total expenditure £17.53k £5.94k £6.11k £4.01k £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A