Financial history ST JOHN'S COLLEGE LIMITED

Charity number: 701294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £5.41m £5.76m £6.02m £6.38m £6.37m
Total expenditure £4.99m £6.23m £6.39m £6.75m £6.66m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.22k £5.26k £5.34k £265.13k £47.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.31m £5.63m £5.89m £6.01m £6.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £91.10k £109.39k £110.79k £93.72k £69.80k
Income - Other £996 £15.87k £13.73k £12.66k £31.61k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.99m £6.21m £6.36m £6.73m £6.64m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £26.33k £26.85k £19.07k £18.99k
Expenditure - Governance £15.96k £12.66k £13.50k £13.50k £14.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £26.33k £0 £0 £18.99k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0