Accounts and annual returns ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY

Charity number: 701433
Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 147 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 147 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 01 February 2023 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 12 March 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required