THE SCOTTER CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NONE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/06/2018 | 28/06/2019 | 28/06/2020 | 28/06/2021 | 28/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £21 | £23 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 10 days | |
Annual return | 28 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 375 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 375 days | |
Annual return | 28 June 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 June 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5TH JANUARY 1989.
Charitable objects
(1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SCOTTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS, OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT:- (A) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR; (B) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (C) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; (D) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES. (2) THE TRUSTES MAY APPLY INCOME FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID EITHER DIRECTLY OR BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH APPLY OR UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR PART OF THEIR INCOME FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SCOTTER AND TH NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window