THE SHROPSHIRE HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY (WISLEY TRAINEE) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 701677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 29 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 24 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required