THE SHROPSHIRE HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY (WISLEY TRAINEE) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 701677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £6.02k £5.85k £5.78k £5.76k £10.65k
Total expenditure £9.49k £6.32k £11.90k £12.50k £12.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A