THE SHROPSHIRE HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY (WISLEY TRAINEE) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 701677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AUBREY KIRKHAM Trustee 18 October 2012 None on record
Keith Charles Frederick Weed CBE Trustee 31 July 2020
BUSINESS IN THE COMMUNITY Received: 10 days late
THE ROYAL HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY Received: On time
Christopher Jones Trustee 10 February 2014 None on record
JAMES HODGSON Trustee None on record
RICHARD WHITTINGHAM Chair 13 February 2017 None on record
SANDY MUIRHEAD Trustee 26 November 2013 None on record