THOMAS HERBERT SMITH'S TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WITHIN THE PARISH OF GROBY IN LEICESTERSHIRE: a) RELIEF OF THE AGED AND POOR b) RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS c) PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION d) PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 22 June 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MARTIN GRIFFIN | Chair | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Griffiths | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA JOAN JONES | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN HOWARD ALLISON | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE CRAIG | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.13k | £18.59k | £16.34k | £17.50k | £18.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.93k | £20.18k | £9.22k | £13.08k | £16.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 04 November 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 12 DECEMBER 1988
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA, IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS OR IN SUCH OTHER WAY AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT: (A) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED AND POOR, (B) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (C) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GROBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Westbury Road
Stockingford
Nuneaton
Warwickshire
CV10 8HG
- Phone:
- 07365947330
- Email:
- thsmithstf@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window