'HEART CONCERN' LANCASTER, MORECAMBE AND DISTRICT HEART SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 701746
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.56k £16.51k £4.50k £28.81k £128
Total expenditure £5.92k £14.63k £11.29k £18.61k £2.05k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A